Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3290404 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3290404



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 378
16.10.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.12.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
14.11.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.10.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
31.10.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
05.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 58
05.07.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 58
18.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.02.2019 Description Search / examination 52
18.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.02.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.12.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
07.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.09.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.09.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
07.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.03.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.02.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.12.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
07.12.2017 European search report Search / examination 3
07.12.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
01.12.2017 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
28.11.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.09.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
15.09.2017 Description Search / examination 61
15.09.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
15.09.2017 Drawings Search / examination 3
15.09.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67