EP3296235 - CASCADE DE-LAYERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Industry, Inc. 100 Technology Drive Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWIVEDI, Rajeev 9109 Elissa Court Plano, TX Texas 75025 / US | 02 /
YAKLIN, Michael 416 Leisure Lane Coppell, TX Texas 75019 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17191400.5 | 15.09.2017 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | US201662395626P | 16.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662395626 P | US201662432860P | 12.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662432860 P | US201715701824 | 12.09.2017 Original published format: US201715701824 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3296235 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/26, B65G47/68, B65G59/12 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
B65G59/12 (EP,US);
B65G47/26 (EP,US);
B65G47/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASKADENENTSCHICHTUNG | [2018/12] | English: | CASCADE DE-LAYERING | [2018/12] | French: | DÉSTRATIFICATION EN CASCADE | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/28] | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0006475 (CRISPLANT AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * pages 1-20; figures 1-6 * [Y] 4,9; | [X]US6662929 (NEARY JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * columns 1-14; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2002079194 (YDOATE EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * pages 1-7; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5641052 (LAZZAROTTI S JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * columns 1-20; figures 1-17 *; | [Y]US2013319830 (OTA KEIKO [JP]) [Y] 4,9 * pages 1-6; figures 1-12 * |