Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015179382 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2016 | A3 | WO2015179382 | 26.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462000221 | 19.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11707021 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | B2 | US2021368690 | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462000221 | 19.05.2014 | US202117401779 | 13.08.2021 | US201615269071 | 19.09.2016 | US201514716229 | 19.05.2015 | US201916433741 | 06.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11432465 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B2 | US2019281767 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462000221 | 19.05.2014 | US201615269071 | 19.09.2016 | US201514716229 | 19.05.2015 | US201916433741 | 06.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11375670 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2022 | B2 | US2020275611 | 03.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462000221 | 19.05.2014 | US201514716229 | 19.05.2015 | US202015929731 | 19.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10721872 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2015327442 | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462000221 | 19.05.2014 | US201514716229 | 19.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10363716 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2019 | B2 | US2017001400 | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615269071 | 19.09.2016 | US201514716229 | 19.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2949670 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | C | CA2949670 | 26.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462000221 | 19.05.2014 | WO2015US31554 | 19.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2979636 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615269071 | 19.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3296020 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2022 | B1 | EP3296020 | 21.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615269071 | 19.09.2016 |