Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011135287 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011135286 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011135285 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011135284 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022117797 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | US202117372252 | 09.07.2021 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | US202117565840 | 30.12.2021 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201715633670 | 26.06.2017 | US201816118339 | 30.08.2018 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022117796 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | US202117372252 | 09.07.2021 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US202117565346 | 29.12.2021 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201715633670 | 26.06.2017 | US201816118339 | 30.08.2018 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022117795 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | US202117372252 | 09.07.2021 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | US202117565334 | 29.12.2021 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201715633670 | 26.06.2017 | US201816118339 | 30.08.2018 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022000670 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | US202117372252 | 09.07.2021 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201715633670 | 26.06.2017 | US201816118339 | 30.08.2018 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9808561 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2015320604 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9061095 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2015 | B2 | US2011282309 | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11090195 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2021 | B2 | US2019008690 | 10.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | US201816118352 | 30.08.2018 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201715633670 | 26.06.2017 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11058587 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2021 | B2 | US2019008689 | 10.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201715633670 | 26.06.2017 | US201816118339 | 30.08.2018 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10159604 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2018 | B2 | US2017290709 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | US201514715399 | 18.05.2015 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | US201715633670 | 26.06.2017 | US201113092042 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6867337B | Global Dossier | 28.04.2021 | B2 | JP2018175894 | 15.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6373890B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B2 | JP2016116943 | 30.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6165230B | Global Dossier | 19.07.2017 | B2 | JP2016041379 | 31.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6275678B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2018 | B2 | JP2016026058 | 12.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6121322B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2017 | B2 | JP2013529942 | 25.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5868960B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013526938 | 27.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5837049B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2015 | B2 | JP2013524973 | 20.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5883850B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | JP2013524972 | 20.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5908458B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2016 | B2 | JP2013524971 | 20.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4223265 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2024 | B1 | EP4223265 | 09.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19201361 | 21.04.2011 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | EP14187266 | 21.04.2011 | EP21206234 | 21.04.2011 | EP11722120 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4023197 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2023 | B1 | EP4023197 | 06.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19201361 | 21.04.2011 | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | EP14187266 | 21.04.2011 | EP11722120 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3777795 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | EP11722119 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | EP17191516 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3628289 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP3628289 | 01.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | EP14187266 | 21.04.2011 | EP11722120 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3539579 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | EP11722123 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3207905 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | EP11722122 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2821035 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2019 | B1 | EP2821035 | 07.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | EP11722120 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2571467 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2017 | B1 | EP2571467 | 27.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2563422 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2019 | B8 | EP2563422 | 26.06.2019 | B1 | EP2563422 | 06.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2563308 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | B1 | EP2563308 | 06.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2563307 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2017 | B1 | EP2563307 | 06.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2563306 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | B1 | EP2563306 | 06.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106943636B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | B | CN106943636 | 14.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | CN201180031860 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104840301 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | CN201180031855 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103124543B | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | B | CN103124543 | 29.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103096946B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2017 | B | CN103096946 | 08.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103079505B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B | CN103079505 | 01.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103079503B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B | CN103079503 | 01.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103037822B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B | CN103037822 | 10.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2799652 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | C | CA2799652 | 24.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2797595 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2020 | C | CA2797595 | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2797594 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | C | CA2797594 | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2797334 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2020 | C | CA2797334 | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2797333 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2020 | C | CA2797333 | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015201022B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2016 | B2 | AU2015201022 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2011254360 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | AU2015201022 | 27.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011254360B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2014 | B2 | AU2011254360 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011247127B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | B2 | AU2011247127 | 14.02.2013 | A2 | AU2011247127 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011247126B | Global Dossier | 15.01.2015 | B2 | AU2011247126 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011247125B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2015 | B2 | AU2011247125 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011247124B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | B2 | AU2011247124 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3287106 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2020 | B1 | EP3287106 | 28.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | EP11722119 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012027536 | 02.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012027537 | 02.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012027539 | 02.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012027620 | 09.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012029302 | 26.07.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2563307T | 17.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2571467T | 02.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2536502T | 26.05.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2571332T | 24.05.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2629634T | 11.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2651949T | 30.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2744469T | 25.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2768425T | 22.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201006983D0 | 09.06.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201006985D0 | 09.06.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201006986D0 | 09.06.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201006988D0 | 09.06.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE033309T | 28.11.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE048406T | 28.07.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012012545 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX337492 | 08.03.2016 | B | MX2012012546 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX337519 | 09.03.2016 | B | MX2012012547 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX338433 | 14.04.2016 | B | MX2012012548 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX336885 | 03.02.2016 | B | MX2012013389 | 11.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX349522 | 01.08.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2571467T | 17.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2573816 | 27.01.2016 | C2 | RU2012149479 | 10.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2560994 | 20.08.2015 | C2 | RU2012149590 | 10.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2012149591 | 10.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2560973 | 20.08.2015 | C2 | RU2012150132 | 10.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2573040 | 20.01.2016 | C2 | RU2012153831 | 27.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201208051 | 26.06.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | GB201006986 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00622 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201208052 | 26.06.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | GB201006983 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00625 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201208053 | 26.06.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | GB201006985 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00626 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201208055 | 26.06.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | GB201006988 | 27.04.2010 | WO2011GB00628 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201208666 | 31.07.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2011GB00621 | 21.04.2011 | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011144888 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201008347D0 | 07.07.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE037995T | 28.09.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2015150085 | 14.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201008347 | 19.05.2010 | Type | Divisional application | EP3777795 | Type | Earlier application | EP2571467 |