EP3460306 - PIPE WITH CONNECTING FLANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FiberSol GmbH Rothenbaumchaussee 54 20148 Hamburg / DE | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNAP, Branko IOC Neverke 66 6256 KO-ANA / SI | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17192037.4 | 20.09.2017 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460306 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/024, F16L23/028, F16L23/032, F16L47/14 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
F16L23/024 (EP);
F16L23/028 (EP);
F16L23/0283 (EP);
F16L23/0286 (EP);
F16L23/032 (EP);
F16L47/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHR MIT VERBINDUNGSFLANSCH | [2019/13] | English: | PIPE WITH CONNECTING FLANGE | [2019/13] | French: | TUYAU DOTÉ D'UNE BRIDE DE CONNEXION | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 18.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2107514 (ROLLMAPLAST AG) [X] 1-5,8,9,12-15 * page 2, line 25 - page 6, line l * * claim 13 * * figure - *[I] 6,7,10,11; | [XI]DE8627380U (FISCHER) [X] 1-5,9-15 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6, line l * * figure - * [I] 6-8; | [X]WO2014030316 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [000l] * * figures 18-41 * |