EP3460424 - A DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE MECHANICAL CONDITION OF A MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MJB Innovations Limited Crane Street 8 Dublin / IE | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fryar, James 18 Woodberry Finnstown Priory Lucan Co. Dublin / IE | 02 /
Berry, Michael Flat 2, 8 Windsor Avenue, Fairview 3 Dublin / IE | 03 /
Looney, Brendan Riveria Rock mount Drimoleage Cork / IE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Reedy, Orlaith PurdyLucey Intellectual Property Limited 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17192040.8 | 20.09.2017 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460424 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/10, G01H1/00, // G07C3/14 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G01H3/10 (EP);
G01H1/003 (EP);
G07C3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES MECHANISCHEN ZUSTANDS EINER MASCHINE | [2019/13] | English: | A DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE MECHANICAL CONDITION OF A MACHINE | [2019/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ÉTAT MÉCANIQUE D'UNE MACHINE | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6199018 (QUIST NANCY L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15 * figures 1, 2A, 2B, 2C-1 * * claim 2 * * column 5, line 22 - line 27 * * column 7, line 62 * * column 8, line 20 - column 9, line 6 * * column 9, line 22 - line 45 * * column 12, line 51 - line 60 * * column 13, line 25 - line 40 * [Y] 14; | [XY]US6297742 (CANADA RONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * figures 1-5 * * column 4, line 23 - line 35 * * column 6, line 1 - line 10 * * column 11, line 48 - line 52 * * column 13, line 57 - line 65 * [Y] 13,14; | [XY]EP1431727 (TEXTRON SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0062] * [Y] 13,14; | [Y]US2004124827 (WINN GREGORY SCOTT [US]) [Y] 8-10 * figure 1 * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0023] *; | [XY]US2015082887 (HASCHKE ARNO [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,6,15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * [Y] 7-14; | [Y] - Hugh Robjohns ET AL, "Why do I sometimes see singers using two microphones on stage?", (20100701), URL: https://www.soundonsound.com/sound-advice/q-why-do-i-sometimes-see-singers-using-two-microphones-stage, (20180313), XP055459085 [Y] 7-12 * Figure (top) * | [Y] - WIESNER THOMAS ET AL, "Microphone calibration for the measurement of acoustic transfer functions", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (I2MTC) PROCEEDINGS, IEEE, (20150511), doi:10.1109/I2MTC.2015.7151573, pages 1910 - 1915, XP033171338 [Y] 11,12 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/I2MTC.2015.7151573 |