EP3316026 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUH, Duckjong 107-2402, 24, Digital-ro Gwangmyeong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LIM, Ho 3101-1503, Gwanggyo Sangnok Apt. Ha-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
YANG, Gihoon 215-304, Hyundai 2-cha Apt. Wolpi-dong Sangnok-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17192408.7 | 21.09.2017 | [2018/18] | Priority number, date | KR20160141419 | 27.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160141419 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316026 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/1337 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
G02F1/133514 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133609 (CN);
G02F1/133723 (CN,KR,US);
G02B6/0229 (KR);
G02F1/133345 (KR);
G02F1/133512 (KR);
G02F1/133528 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133553 (KR);
G02F1/133617 (EP,US);
G02F1/13362 (CN);
G02F1/133707 (KR,US);
G02F1/133726 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/18] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/18] | French: | AFFICHEUR | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2010079704 (CHO DON-CHAN [KR], et al) [I] 1-12,18-22 * paragraphs [0070] - [0094]; figure 3 * [Y] 13-17; | [A]US2016026041 (LIM HO [KR]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0165] - [0172] *; | [Y]US2016033823 (LEE KWANG KEUN [KR], et al) [Y] 13-15 * paragraphs [0133] - [0134]; figure 14 *; | [Y]CN105353554 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [Y] 16,17* paragraphs [0046] - [0056]; figure 7 * |