EP3460202 - STEAM TURBINE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennauer, Martin Steinmannswiese 76 46242 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
Borowski, Marc Friesenstr. 12 47445 Moers / DE | 03 /
Schindler, Christoph Rheinstraße 57 45219 Essen / DE | 04 /
Veltmann, David Rellinghauser Straße 75 45128 Essen / DE | 05 /
Winkel, Michael An den Wieden 7 46284 Dorsten / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17192638.9 | 22.09.2017 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460202 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01K7/08, F01K7/24 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
F01K7/08 (EP,KR,US);
F01D17/145 (KR);
F01K7/24 (EP,KR,US);
G05B11/42 (KR);
F05D2270/301 (US);
F05D2270/303 (US);
F05D2270/706 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAMPFTURBINENREGELUNG | [2019/13] | English: | STEAM TURBINE CONTROL | [2019/13] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE TURBINE À VAPEUR | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3928972 (OSBORNE ROBERT L) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4118935 (ANDERSSON GORAN) [X] 1,8,15 * column 2, line 7 - column 4, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2074757 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5042246 (MOORE JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2011056201 (KLUGE STEVEN CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0033]; figures 2,3 *; | [I]DE102013226551 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1,8,15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016206974 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | DE60121679T |