EP3299173 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING EJECTION HOLE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SII Printek Inc 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irokawa, Daiki c/o SII Printek Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | 01 /
IROKAWA, Daiki c/o SII Printek Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 17192994.6 | 25.09.2017 | [2018/13] | Priority number, date | JP20160186455 | 26.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016186455 | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299173 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23P6/00, B23K26/18, B23K26/40, B23K26/402, B41J2/14, B23K26/382, B23K26/384, B23K26/066, B23K103/00, B23K103/04, B41J2/16 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
B41J2/1634 (EP,US);
B23K26/382 (CN);
B23K26/066 (EP,US);
B23K26/18 (EP,US);
B23K26/384 (EP,US);
B23K26/389 (EP,US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
B23K26/402 (EP,US);
B23K26/70 (CN);
B23P6/00 (US);
B41J2/14209 (EP,US);
B41J2/1433 (EP,US);
B41J2/1609 (EP,US);
B41J2/162 (EP,US);
B41J2/1626 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1629 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (CN);
B23K2103/04 (EP,US);
B23K2103/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | B41J2/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2018/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AUSSTOSSLOCHPLATTE | [2018/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING EJECTION HOLE PLATE | [2018/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUE À TROUS D'ÉJECTION | [2018/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 21.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003103107 (CHENG CHEN-HSIUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * Step 420: hole diameter is determined, Step 470: if the desired hole diameter not reached the process is repeated; paragraph [0040]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0786348 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 26, line 52 - column 27, line 5 *; | [A]WO2015071729 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * Step S210: if the desired hole diameter is not reached repeat the laser drilling;; figure 9 *; | [A]US2003075622 (MORITA HIROMICHI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0076]; figures 8b, 9 *; | [A]JP2006334903 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1 * burrs are melted; paragraphs [0051] , [0052]; figures 10f, 10g *; | [A]EP1295647 (THE TECHNOLOGY PARTNERSHIP PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 59]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2010134560 (DOI ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0062]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JP2007203650 |