EP3301068 - INDUSTRIAL TRUCK WITH AN OPERATING LEVER AND A METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH AN INDUSTRIAL TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geilsdorf, Hendrik Bruno-Lauenroth-Weg 3 22417 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Sellentin, Jörn Ortelsburger Straße 34 24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | 03 /
Grothkopp Dr., Hartwig Holsteiner Chaussee 155 22523 Hamburg / DE | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/14] | 01 /
Geilsdorf Dr., Hendrik Bruno-Lauenroth-Weg 3 22417 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
Sellentin, Jörn Ortelsburger Straße 34 24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | |||
03 /
Grothkopp, Hartwig Holsteiner Chaussee 155 22523 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 17193235.3 | 26.09.2017 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | DE201610118460 | 29.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016118460 | [2018/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301068 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3301068 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/20, // G05G9/047 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
B66F9/20 (EP,US);
B66F9/0759 (US);
B66F9/07581 (US);
G05G1/04 (US);
G05G5/05 (US);
G05G2009/04766 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2018/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLURFÖRDERZEUG MIT EINEM BEDIENHEBEL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BEDIENUNG EINES SOLCHEN FLURFÖRDERZEUGS | [2018/14] | English: | INDUSTRIAL TRUCK WITH AN OPERATING LEVER AND A METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH AN INDUSTRIAL TRUCK | [2018/14] | French: | CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION DOTÉ D'UN LEVIER DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 02.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 26.09.2023 | LU | 26.09.2023 | GB | 26.10.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 26.09.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 26.09.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 26.09.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9824180 (IMMERSION HUMAN INTERFACE CORP [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * page 17, line 14 - line 15 ** figure 3b *; | [XI]DE102007060336 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * abstract * * figure - * [I] 5,12; | [XI]US2016179128 (GUGLIELMO KENNON [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1,2,4-7,9,10 * [I] 5,12-14 | Examination | US5125602 | US2014214273 |