EP3460594 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A HOME APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÇAKIR, Ímdat C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | 02 /
VARAN, Bahri Burakhan C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17193297.3 | 26.09.2017 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460594 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02, // H04L12/28 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/2814 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/282 (US);
H04L12/2827 (US);
G05B2219/2642 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/2841 (US);
H04L2012/285 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTES | [2019/13] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A HOME APPLIANCE | [2019/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL MÉNAGER | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.02.2022 | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/22] | 28.01.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 17.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017250835 (KIM JUN-HYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0115] ** figures 1-4,11,12B * |