EP3462105 - HOT-WATER SUPPLY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | For all designated states Daikin Europe N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Kota DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | 02 /
BRYSSE, Joris DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2019/14] | Application number, filing date | 17193820.2 | 28.09.2017 | [2019/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462105 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F24H4/04, F24H9/02, F24H9/06, F24H9/20, F24H1/18 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
F24H9/06 (EP);
F24H9/2021 (EP,US);
F24H1/182 (EP);
F24H4/04 (EP);
F24H9/02 (EP);
F24H9/2007 (EP,US);
F24H15/281 (EP,US);
F24H15/395 (EP,US);
F24H15/421 (EP,US);
F24H15/464 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEISSWASSERVERSORGUNGSINHEIT | [2019/14] | English: | HOT-WATER SUPPLY UNIT | [2019/14] | French: | UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN EAU CHAUD | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/14] | 30.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 11.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2413061 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2013221695 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2933580 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * columns 13-20; figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2016191535 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2017072366 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | CN104930702 |