EP3312786 - OPTIMIZED DIGITAL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanan, Shibani 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US | 02 /
Ramachandran, Vinod Kumar 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US | 03 /
Harris, Christopher K. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US | 04 /
Hsiao, Sissie Ling-le 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 17193902.8 | 06.06.2017 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | US201615250247 | 29.08.2016 Original published format: US201615250247 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312786 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q30/02, G06F17/30 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G06Q10/101 (EP,US);
G06F16/316 (CN);
G06F16/986 (US);
G06F16/248 (EP,US);
G06F16/338 (CN);
G06F16/438 (EP,US);
G06F16/93 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (CN);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F40/10 (CN);
G06F40/103 (US);
G06F40/279 (CN);
G06Q30/0242 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] |
Former [2018/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE DIGITALE KOMPONENTEN | [2018/17] | English: | OPTIMIZED DIGITAL COMPONENTS | [2018/17] | French: | COMPOSANTS NUMÉRIQUES OPTIMISÉS | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 26.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17740141.1 / EP3308334 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015026144 (WAI CONRAD [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0044] - [0049]; figure 2A *; | [A]US2016155143 (HSIAO SISSIE LING-LE [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0275] - [0291] * |