EP3461783 - LIFTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LIFTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/14] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LIFTING DEVICE | ||
[2019/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B&R Industrial Automation GmbH B & R Strasse 1 5142 Eggelsberg / AT | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skotschek, Ralf Schlühslmayrstraße 61/4 4400 Steyr / AT | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [2019/14] | Application number, filing date | 17194041.4 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3461783 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3461783 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/48, B66C19/00 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
B66C13/48 (EP,BR,US);
B66C13/08 (CN);
B65G1/0464 (US);
B65G43/00 (BR,US);
B66C13/04 (US);
B66C13/06 (CN);
B66C13/18 (CN);
B66C15/04 (CN);
B66C19/002 (EP,US);
Y02B10/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] | Title | German: | HEBEEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER HEBEEINRICHTUNG | [2019/21] | English: | LIFTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LIFTING DEVICE | [2019/21] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE LEVAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE LEVAGE | [2019/21] |
Former [2019/14] | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER HEBEEINRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2019/14] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LIFTING DEVICE | ||
Former [2019/14] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE LEVAGE | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/14] | 22.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2017 | AL | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | HR | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 13.11.2019 | |
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 13.11.2019 | |
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 13.11.2019 | |
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6065619 (MIYATA NORIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 4 - column 10 *; | [A]EP2402280 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A] - HUANG Y ET AL, "The optimum route problem by genetic algorithm for loading/unloading of yard crane", COMPUTERS & INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING, PERGAMON, vol. 56, no. 3, ISSN 0360-8352, (20090404), pages 993 - 1001, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S036083520800199X?via%3Dihub, (20180320), XP025962128 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cie.2008.09.035 | by applicant | US2007289931 |