EP3421464 - RHO-ASSOCIATED PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITOR, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME, AS WELL AS PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Tide Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Yanping No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
Wang, Hongjun No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
Li, Gong No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
Jiang, Yuanyuan No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
Li, Xiang No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
Zhou, Liying No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
Liu, Yanan No.8 East Rongjing Street BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Paulraj, Leonita Theresa, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Paulraj, Leonita Theresa, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | ||
Former [2019/01] | Paulraj, Leonita Theresa, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17194108.1 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/01] | Priority number, date | WO2017CN91086 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: PCT/CN2017/091086 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421464 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3421464 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/501 (KR);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (KR);
A61P37/00 (KR);
A61P9/10 (KR);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2019/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RHO-ASSOZIIERTE PROTEINKINASEHEMMER, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/01] | English: | RHO-ASSOCIATED PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITOR, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME, AS WELL AS PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF | [2019/01] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE PROTÉINE KINASE ASSOCIÉE À RHO, COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE LE CONTENANT AINSI QUE SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 28.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2017 | AL | 24.11.2021 | AT | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | CZ | 24.11.2021 | DK | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | ES | 24.11.2021 | FI | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | IT | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | MT | 24.11.2021 | PL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SE | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | BG | 24.02.2022 | NO | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | IS | 24.03.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012202793 (SWEETNAM PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [A]WO2014055996 (KADMON CORP LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * page 142; table 1; compound 166 * | by applicant | - T. L. GILCHRIST, Comprehensive Organic Synthesis, Academic Press, vol. 7, pages 748 - 750 | - G. W. H. CHEESEMAN; E. S. G. WERSTIUK, Advances in Heterocyclic Chemistry,, Academic Press, vol. 22, pages 390 - 392 | - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", ACS Symposium Series, vol. 14 |