06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
03.12.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
17.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
27.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
25.12.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
22.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.10.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.10.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.06.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.06.2020 |
Change - inventor |
|
05.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
18.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.08.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.08.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
03.08.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
02.02.2018 |
Change - inventor |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
12.01.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
09.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|