EP3309253 - GENES FOR BIOSYNTHESIS OF TETRACYCLINE COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univerza v Ljubljani Kongresni trg 12 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETKOVIC, Hrvoje Ulica bratov Ucakar 36 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 02 /
RASPOR, Peter Neubergerjeva 13 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 03 /
LESNIK, Urska Ulica Zore Majcenove 4 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 17194792.2 | 07.08.2009 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | EP20080014141 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: EP 08014141 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309253 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3309253 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/195, C07C237/26 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
C07C237/26 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07C225/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GENE FÜR DIE BIOSYNTHESE VON TETRACYCLIN-VERBINDUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/16] | English: | GENES FOR BIOSYNTHESIS OF TETRACYCLINE COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/16] | French: | GÈNES POUR LA BIOSYNTHÈSE DE COMPOSÉS DE TÉTRACYCLINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 18.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09010246.8 / EP2154150 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2009 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | ES | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | IT | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | NL | 14.10.2020 | PL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.08.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MK | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 07.08.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3824285 (BLACKWOOD R, et al) [X] 1 * structure IX; columns 3-4 * * column 2, line 32 - line 35 * [I] 2; | [XI] - I CHOPRA, "Tetracycline analogs whose primary target is not the bacterial ribosome", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (19940401), vol. 38, no. 4, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 637 - 640, XP055452259 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 3-5 | [A] - ZAKERI BIJAN ET AL, "Chemical biology of tetracycline antibiotics", BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, (200804), vol. 86, no. 2, ISSN 0829-8211, pages 124 - 136, XP002500431 [A] 1-9 * page 127, column r, paragraph l - page 129, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/O08-002 | [A] - ZHANG WENJUN ET AL, "Engineered biosynthesis of a novel amidated polyketide, using the malonamyl-specific initiation module from the oxytetracycline polyketide synthase", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200604), vol. 72, no. 4, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2573 - 2580, XP002500434 [A] 1-9 * see the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.72.4.2573-2580.2006 | [A] - ZHANG WENJUN ET AL, "Investigation of early tailoring reactions in the oxytetracycline biosynthetic pathway", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (200708), vol. 282, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 25717 - 25725, XP002500433 [A] 1-9 * see the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M703437200 | by applicant | - PROJAN et al., SIM News, (20060000), vol. 55, pages 52 - 60 | - ROBERTS M., Microbiol Mol Biol Rev, (20010000), vol. 65, pages 232 - 260 | - CHOPRA I, Antimicrob Agents Chemother, (20040000), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 637 - 40 | - OLIVIA et al., Antimicrob Agents Chemother, (19920000), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 913 - 919 | - CHOPRA et al., Curr Opin Pharmacol, (20010000), vol. l, no. 5, pages 464 - 9 | - LIU et al., Antimicrob agents chemother, (20020000), vol. 46, pages 1447 - 1454 | - DOMERCQ; MATUTE, Trends Pharmacol Sci. 2004, (20040000), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 609 - 12 | - BRUNDULA et al., Brain, (20020000), vol. 125, pages 1297 - 308 | - FIFE et al., Cancer Lett., (20000000), vol. 153, no. 1-2, pages 75 - 8 | - PETERSON J.T., Heart Fail Rev., (20040000), vol. 9, pages 63 - 79 | - DEZUBE et al., J Clin Oncol., (20060000), vol. 24, no. 9, pages 1389 - 94 | - YU et al., Arthritis Rheum., (19921000), vol. 35, no. 10, pages 1150 - 9 | - WILIAMS et al., Adv Dent Res., (19981100), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 71 - 5 | - TILLEY et al., Ann Intern Med., (19950000), vol. 122, no. 2, pages 81 - 89 | - BRODERSEN et al., Cell, (20000000), vol. 103, pages 1143 - 54 | - ALTSCHUL et al., JMol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ZHANG, Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 2573 - 2580 | - ZHANG et al., J Biol Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, no. 35, pages 25727 - 25 | - PERIC-CONCHA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, no. 45, pages 37455 - 60 | - DAIRI et al., Biosci. Biotechnol. Biochem., (19950000), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1099 - 106 | - METSA-KETELA et al., FEMS Microbiol Lett., (19990000), vol. 180, no. l, page l-6 | - BIERMAN et al., Gene, (19920000), vol. 116, pages 43 - 49 | - BIRNBOIM HC; DOLY J., DNA Nucleic Acids Res., (19790000), vol. 7, pages 1513 - 1523 | - MENENDEZ et al., Chem Biol., (20040000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 21 - 32 | - FERNANDEZ-MORENO, J Biol Chem., vol. 267, no. 27, pages 19278 - 90 | - BISANG et al., Nature, (19990000), vol. 401, pages 502 - 505 | - WALSH et al., Curr Opin Chem Biol., (19970000), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 309 - 15 | - ZHANG et al., J Nat Prod., (20060000), vol. 69, no. 11, pages 1633 - 6 | - ZHANG et al., J Biol Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, no. 35, pages 25717 - 25 | - PETKOVIC et al., J Biol Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, no. 46, pages 32829 - 34 | - AMES et al., PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 14, pages 5349 - 5354 | - LOMBO et al., Gene, (19960000), vol. 172, no. 1, pages 87 - 91 | - LOZANO et al., J Biol Chem., (20000000), vol. 275, no. 5, pages 3065 - 74 | - RODRIGUEZ et al., J Biol Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, no. 9, pages 8149 - 58 | - ABDELFATTAH; ROHR, Angew Chem Int Ed Engl., (20060000), vol. 45, no. 34, pages 5685 - 9 | - MARTIN; MCMILLAN, Curr. Opin. Struct. Biol., (20020000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 783 - 93 | - HOPWOOD, Chem. Rev., (19970000), vol. 97, pages 2465 - 2497 | - HOPWOOD; SHERMAN, Annual Review of Genetics, (19900000), vol. 24, pages 37 - 66 | - RAWLINGS; CRONAN, J Biol Chem., (19920000), vol. 267, no. 9, pages 5751 - 4 | - ZHANG et al., Chem. Rev., (19970000), vol. 97, pages 2465 - 249 | - MASON; CAMMACK, Annu. Rev. Microbiol., (19920000), vol. 46, pages 277 - 305 | - PRADO et al., Mol Gen Genet., (19990000), vol. 261, no. 2, pages 216 - 25 | - ABDELFATTACH; ROHR, Angew Chem Int Ed Engl., (20060000), vol. 45, no. 34, pages 5685 - 9 | - ZHANG et al., Appl. Environm. Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 2573 - 2580 | - THERIAULT et al., J. Antibiot Mar, (19820000), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 364 - 6 | - ZHANG et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 2573 - 2580 | - THERIAULT, J Antibiot., (19820000), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 364 - 6 | - SUMMERS et al., J.Bac., (19920000), vol. 174, no. 6, pages 1810 - 1820 |