EP3466849 - UNLOADING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR UNLOADING BULK GOODS FROM A TRANSPORT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERDELLE-HILGE, Dr. Peter Neuhauserstrasse 14 b 78464 Konstanz / DE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17194871.4 | 05.10.2017 | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3466849 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G67/20, B65G67/26 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B65G67/20 (EP);
B65G67/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTLADEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTLADEN VON STÜCKGÜTERN AUS EINER TRANSPORTEINHEIT | [2019/15] | English: | UNLOADING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR UNLOADING BULK GOODS FROM A TRANSPORT UNIT | [2019/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCHARGEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCHARGEMENT DE MARCHANDISES DE DÉTAIL D'UNE UNITÉ DE TRANSPORT | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3958701 (YATAGAI SHUKURO, et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-13,15 * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 47 * * figures 7,8 *; | [XA]DE102011083095 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-12,14,15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,13; | [A]DE202015100596U (SCHIER MANFRED [DE]) [A] 5,11 * paragraph [0041] ** figures 1-7 * |