EP3284519 - POLYCYCLIC CARBAMOYLPYRIDONE DERIVATIVE HAVING HIV INTEGRASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare Company 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | For all designated states Shionogi & Co., Ltd 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNS, Brian Alvin GlaxosmithKline P.O. Box 13398 Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, NC North Carolina 27709 / US | 02 /
KAWASUJI, Takashi Shionogi & Co., Ltd 1-1, Futaba-cho 3-chome Toyonaka, Osaka 561-0825 / JP | 03 /
TAISHI, Teruhiko Shionogi & Co., Ltd 12F, Hankyu Terminal Bldg. 1-4, Shibata 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530-0012 / JP | 04 /
TAODA, Yoshiyuki Shionogi Pharmaceutical Research Center 3-1-1 Futaba-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 561-0825 / JP | [2018/11] |
Former [2018/08] | 01 /
JOHNS, Brian Alvin GlaxosmithKline P.O. Box 13398 Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, NC North Carolina 27709 / US | ||
02 /
Kawasuji, Takashi Shionogi & Co., Ltd 12-4 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku, Osaka 553-0002 / JP | |||
03 /
Taishi, Teruhiko Shionogi Pharmaceutical Research Center 3-1-1 Futaba-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 561-0825 / JP | |||
04 /
Taoda, Yoshiyuki Shionogi Pharmaceutical Research Center 3-1-1 Futaba-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 561-0825 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17195276.5 | 28.04.2006 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | JP20050131161 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005131161 | JP20050312076 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005312076 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284519 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3284519 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61P31/18, A61K31/4985, C07D498/04 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
C07D498/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,NO,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,KR,NO,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5365 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/20 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/22 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,NO,US);
C07D498/20 (EP,US);
C07D498/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | POLYZYKLISCHES CARBAMOYLPYRIDON-DERIVATE MIT HIV-INTEGRASEHEMMENDER AKTIVITÄT | [2018/08] | English: | POLYCYCLIC CARBAMOYLPYRIDONE DERIVATIVE HAVING HIV INTEGRASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY | [2018/08] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE CARBAMOYLPYRIDONE POLYCYCLIQUE DOTÉS D'UNE ACTIVITÉ INHIBITRICE DE L'INTÉGRASE DU VIH | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 27.03.2018 | Observations by third parties | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Observations by third parties | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2021 | Observations by third parties | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06758843.4 / EP1874117 | EP12159079.8 / EP2527007 | EP16154531.4 / EP3045206 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004024078 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004058757 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al); | [AP]EP1544199 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) | by applicant | JPH0296506 | JPH02108668 | JPH02108683 | JP2003032772 | WO03016275 | WO03035076 | WO2004004657 | WO2004024693 | US2004133029 | WO2005016927 | WO2002US12173 | other | WO2004024078 | WO2004058757 |