EP3306566 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GeneMind Biosciences Company Limited 502A, 502B & 602, Podium Building Luohu Investment Holdings Building No. 112 Qingshui River 1st Road Qingshui River Community, Qingshui River Street, Luohu District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | For all designated states GeneMind Biosciences Company Limited 502A, 502B & 602, Podium Building Luohu Investment Holdings Building No. 112 Qingshui River 1st Road Qingshui River Community, Qingshui River Street, Luohu District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518023 / CN | ||
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states GeneMind Biosciences Company Limited 5th & 6th F, 2nd Blk Shenye Jinyuan Bldg No.116 Qingshui river 1st Rd Luohu District, Shenzhen City, 518023 / CN | ||
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Direct Genomics Co., Ltd. 1st Floor, 111 Building High-tech Industrial Park 1st Zone No.72 Guowei Road Liantang Street, Luohu District Shenzhen City, Guangdong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Weibin c/o GeneMind Biosciences Company Limited 502A, 502B & 602, Podium Building No. 112 Qingshui River 1st Road Luohu District Shenzhen City, 518023 / CN | 02 /
JIN, Huan c/o GeneMind Biosciences Company Limited 502A, 502B & 602, Podium Building No. 112 Qingshui River 1st Road Luohu District Shenzhen City, 518023 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Qin c/o GeneMind biosciences Company Limited 502A, 502B & 602, Podium Building No. 112 Qingshui River 1st Road Luohu District Shenzhen City, 518023 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Zeifei c/o GeneMind Biosciences company Limited 502A, 502B & 602, Podium Building No. 112 Qingshui River 1st Road Luohu District Shenzhen City, 518023 / CN | 05 /
ZHOU, Zhiliang c/o GeneMind Biosciences Company Limited 502A, 502B & 602, Podium Building No. 112 Qingshui River 1st Road Luohu District Shenzhen City, 518023 / CN | [2022/29] |
Former [2018/15] | 01 /
XU, Weibin c/o Direct Genomics Co., Ltd 1st Floor, 111 Building, High-tech Industrial Park 1st Zone, No.72 Guowei Road, Liantang Street, Luohu District Shenzhen City, Guangdong / CN | ||
02 /
JIN, Huan c/o Direct Genomics Co., Ltd 1st Floor, 111 Building, High-tech Industrial Park 1st Zone, No.72 Guowei Road, Liantang Street, Luohu District Shenzhen City, Guangdong / CN | |||
03 /
YAN, Qin c/o Direct Genomics Co., Ltd 1st Floor, 111 Building, High-tech Industrial Park 1st Zone, No.72 Guowei Road, Liantang Street, Luohu District Shenzhen City, Guangdong / CN | |||
04 /
JIANG, Zeifei c/o Direct Genomics Co., Ltd 1st Floor, 111 Building, High-tech Industrial Park 1st Zone, No.72 Guowei Road, Liantang Street, Luohu District Shenzhen City, Guangdong / CN | |||
05 /
ZHOU, Zhiliang c/o Direct Genomics Co., Ltd 1st Floor, 111 Building, High-tech Industrial Park 1st Zone, No.72 Guowei Road, Liantang Shenzhen City, Guangdong / CN | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2018/15] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17195466.2 | 09.10.2017 | [2018/15] | Priority number, date | CN201610882547 | 10.10.2016 Original published format: CN201610882547 | CN201710607306 | 24.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710607306 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306566 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3306566 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/136, G06K9/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/136 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06V20/695 (US);
G06T2207/20024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] |
Former [2018/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BILDVERARBEITUNG | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING IMAGE | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2018/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.2023
04.05.2023
ADMISSIBLE Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB Opponent's representative Robinson, David Edward Ashdown Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/23] | 19.05.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2017 | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | BG | 03.08.2022 | CY | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | IT | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | MK | 03.08.2022 | MT | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | TR | 03.08.2022 | IE | 09.10.2022 | LU | 09.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 09.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
BG | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
TR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 09.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
TR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 09.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 09.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 09.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 09.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY] - SMAL I ET AL, "Quantitative Comparison of Spot Detection Methods in Fluorescence Microscopy", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100201), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 282 - 301, XP011294426 [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11,14,15 * abstract * * Section B. Detection Framework; page 284, column left - page 285, column left * * Section 6) Grayscale Opening Top-Hat Filter; page 287, column right * [A] 3,6,7,10,13 [Y] 5,12 | [XY] - JULIEN GHAYE ET AL, "Image Thresholding Techniques for Localization of Fluorescent Biomarkers", CYTOMETRY. PART A, US, (20130916), vol. 83, no. 11, doi:10.1002/cyto.a.22345, ISSN 1552-4922, pages 1001 - 1016, XP055428252 [X] 1-4,6-11,13-15 * abstract * * page 1002, column right, paragraph first - page 1003, column left, paragraph first * * Section Segmentation Schemes; page 1003, column right - page 1006, column left * [Y] 5,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.a.22345 | [Y] - Feng He ET AL, "A Laplacian of Gaussian-Based Approach for Spot Detection in Two-Dimensional Gel Electrophoresis Images", IFIP Advances in Information and Communication Technology, (20110101), vol. 347, pages 1 - 8, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-18369-0_2, ISSN 1868-4238, XP055428506 [Y] 5,12 * abstract * * Section 2 Algorithm; page 2 - page 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-18369-0_2 | Opposition | US2005008212 | US8571279 | US8965076 | - Ashton Edward A, Schaum Alan, "Algorithms for the Detection of Sub-Pixel Targets in Multispectral Imagery", Photogrammetric Engineering and Remote Sensing, (19980701), pages 723 - 731, Photogrammetric Engineering and Remote Sensing, URL: https://www.asprs.org/wp-content/uploads/pers/1998journal/jul/1998_jul_723-731.pdf, (20240415), XP093151720 | - I. Smal ; M. Loog ; W. Niessen ; E. Meijering, "Quantitative Comparison of Spot Detection Methods in Fluorescence Microscopy", IEEE Transactions on Medical Imaging, IEEE, USA, USA, (20100201), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 282 - 301, XP011294426 | - Julien Ghaye, Kamat Madhura Avinash, Corbino-Giunta Linda, Silacci Paolo, Vergères Guy, De Micheli Giovanni, Carrara Sandro, "Image Thresholding Techniques for Localization of Fluorescent Biomarkers", Cytometry A, Wiley-Liss, Hoboken, USA, Hoboken, USA, (20130916), vol. 83, no. 11, doi:10.1002/cyto.a.22345, ISSN 1552-4922, pages 1001 - 1016, XP055428252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.a.22345 | - Feng He, Xiong Bangshu, Sun Chengli, Xia Xiaobin, "A Laplacian of Gaussian-Based Approach for Spot Detection in Two-Dimensional Gel Electrophoresis Images", Feng He, Xiong Bangshu, Sun Chengli, Xia Xiaobin, Burg A , International Conference on Intelligent Information Processing, US , Springer New York LLC , (20110101), vol. 347, pages 1 - 8, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-18369-0_2, ISSN 1868-4238, XP055428506 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-18369-0_2 |