Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6978497B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2021 | B2 | JP2020500349 | 09.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160139367 | 25.10.2016 | WO2017KR10868 | 28.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018080042 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160139367 | 25.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10552990 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2020 | B2 | US2018114342 | 26.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160139367 | 25.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102561860B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2023 | B1 | KR20180045359 | 04.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160139367 | 25.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107979773B | Global Dossier | 28.12.2021 | B | CN107979773 | 01.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160139367 | 25.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3316119 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | B1 | EP3316119 | 02.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160139367 | 25.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2886942T | 21.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20160139367 | 25.10.2016 |