EP3470664 - FUEL RAIL ASSEMBLY FOR A FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SUCH A FUEL RAIL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitesco Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serra, Giandomenico Via Calcesana 38/A 56010 Ghezzano - S.Giuliano Terme (PI) / IT | 02 /
Di Domizio, Gisella Via Mazzini, 56c 56017 San Giuliano Terme / IT | 03 /
Weigl, Georg Charles-Lindbergh-Str. 3 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17196394.5 | 13.10.2017 | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470664 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/16, F02M55/02, F02M69/46, F02M61/14, // B23K101/06 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
F02M61/166 (EP);
F02M55/02 (EP);
F02M55/025 (EP);
F02M61/14 (EP);
F02M69/465 (EP);
F02M2200/8084 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFSCHIENENANORDNUNG FÜR EIN BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCH EINER BRENNSTOFFSCHIENENANORDNUNG | [2019/16] | English: | FUEL RAIL ASSEMBLY FOR A FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SUCH A FUEL RAIL ASSEMBLY | [2019/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE RAMPE DE CARBURANT DESTINÉ À UN SYSTÈME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL ENSEMBLE RAMPE DE CARBURANT | [2019/16] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 17.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/12] | 16.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0273279 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 15 * page 2, line 10 - line 26 *; | [A]JP3342329B (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 15* paragraph [0016]; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US2006243353 (MILAM DAVID L [US]) [A] 1,11 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2007012748 (MCCRINK EDWARD J [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2010001215 (SUZUKI KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 2 *; | [A]WO2010050566 (KANBISHI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2014261330 (DOHERTY ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 52]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP2789845 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,11-13 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]KR20150048548 (HYUNDAI KEFICO CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2017050850 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 16, line 27 - line 32; figure 4 * |