|
05.12.2022 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
11.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2022 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
27.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |