EP3315720 - COMPRESSOR ROTOR OF A FLUID FLOW MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 OT Dahlewitz 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANN, Erik Möckernkiez 18 10963 Berlin / DE | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus Patentanwalt Teltower Damm 15 14169 Berlin / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 17197040.3 | 18.10.2017 | [2018/18] | Priority number, date | DE201610120346 | 25.10.2016 Original published format: DE102016120346 | [2018/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3315720 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3315720 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/34, F01D5/02, F01D5/30 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
F01D5/02 (EP,US);
F04D29/324 (US);
F01D5/14 (EP,US);
F01D5/147 (EP,US);
F01D5/3061 (EP,US);
F01D5/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTERROTOR EINER STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE | [2018/18] | English: | COMPRESSOR ROTOR OF A FLUID FLOW MACHINE | [2018/18] | French: | ROTOR DE COMPRESSEUR D'UNE TURBOMACHINE | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 04.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/06] | 23.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]GB2255138 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,12 * abstract * [A] 6,7 [Y] 13-15 [I] 9-11; | [Y]EP1507064 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0015]; figure 8 *; | [XAYI]JP2009197649 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-5,8,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0035]; figures 1,3,5,7 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 13-15 [I] 9-11; | [Y]DE102008052247 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]GB2468722 (LEIGH WARREN BARRATT [GB]) [A] 14,15* page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [XAYI]EP3002414 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8,12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] , [0032] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 2,4 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 13-15 [I] 9-11 |