EP3416311 - TEST SYSTEM AND TEST METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rowell, Corbett Benediktenwandstrasse 7 81545 München / DE | 02 /
Pabst, Alexander Veilchenweg 37 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17197084.1 | 18.10.2017 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | US201715622631 | 14.06.2017 Original published format: US201715622631 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416311 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3416311 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, // H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H04K3/94 (EP,US);
G01R29/10 (CN);
H01Q3/267 (US);
H01Q25/00 (US);
H04B17/0085 (EP,US);
H04B17/102 (US);
H04B17/104 (EP,US);
H04B17/15 (EP,US);
H04B17/29 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TESTSYSTEM UND TESTVERFAHREN | [2018/51] | English: | TEST SYSTEM AND TEST METHOD | [2018/51] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESSAI | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 07.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2017 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | IT | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | LU | 18.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.10.2017 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014174298 (AMPHENOL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2016013563 (TIMOFEEV IGOR E [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 3C *; | [XAY]EP3104539 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035] * [A] 3,5,6,11-13 [Y] 7,14; | [YA] - Rohde And Schwarz, "Antenna Array Testing -Conducted and Over the Air: The Way to 5G White Paper Table of Contents 1MA286_2e Rohde & Schwarz Antenna Array Testing -Conducted and Over the Air: The Way to 5G 2 1 Introduction: What is 5G?", (20170320), URL: https://cdn.rohde-schwarz.com/pws/dl_downloads/dl_application/application_notes/1ma286/1MA286_2e_AntArrTest_5G.pdf, (20171128), XP055429495 [Y] 7,14 * Chapter 4 OTA Antenna Measurements * [A] 1-6,8-13,15 |