EP3316181 - METHOD FOR DETECTING OBJECTS IN A BEARING AND INDUSTRIAL TRUCK WITH A DEVICE FOR DETECTING OBJECTS IN A STORAGE LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopelke, Jan Alsterdorfer Straße 537 22337 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Schulz, Eckhard Norderstraße 43 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 17197314.2 | 19.10.2017 | [2018/18] | Priority number, date | DE201610120386 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: DE102016120386 | [2018/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316181 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3316181 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62, B25J9/16, B66F9/06 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
G06V20/647 (EP,US);
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
B66F9/063 (EP,US);
G06T1/0007 (US);
G06T7/74 (US);
G06V10/7515 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
G06T2200/04 (US);
G06T2207/30108 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN VON OBJEKTEN IN EINEM LAGER UND FLURFÖRDERZEUG MIT EINER EINRICHTUNG ZUM ERKENNEN VON OBJEKTEN IN EINEM LAGER | [2018/18] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING OBJECTS IN A BEARING AND INDUSTRIAL TRUCK WITH A DEVICE FOR DETECTING OBJECTS IN A STORAGE LOCATION | [2018/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'OBJETS DANS UN ENTREPÔT ET CHARIOT ÉLÉVATEUR DOTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'OBJETS DANS UN ENTREPÔT | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 22.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2021 | 15.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2017 | AL | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | IE | 19.10.2021 | LU | 19.10.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.10.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.10.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.10.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.10.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 19.10.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.10.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.10.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 28.07.2021 | |
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2014232826 (HALATA PHILIPP [DE]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0099]; figures 1-16 * [A] 1-7,11,12; | [A]US2015347840 (IIDA MASAOMI [JP]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1,3,7,8,10-13 *; | [XYI] - BAGLIVO L ET AL, "Autonomous pallet localization and picking for industrial forklifts: a robust range and look method;Autonomous pallet localization and picking for industrial forklifts", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20110707), vol. 22, no. 8, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/22/8/085502, ISSN 0957-0233, page 85502, XP020208768 [X] 1,3-5,7,11 * sections 3-5;; figures 2-11 * [Y] 8-10 [I] 2,6,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/22/8/085502 |