EP3312353 - MULTI-PORT VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAG Aerospace Industries, LLC 1500 Glenn Curtiss Street Carson CA 90746 / US | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boodaghians, Razmik B. c/o MAG Aerospace Industries LLC 1500 Glenn Curtiss Street Carson, CA 90746 / US | 02 /
Birbeck, Timothy c/o MAG Aerospace Industries LLC 1500 Glenn Curtiss Street Carson, CA 90746 / US | 03 /
Weber, Sebastien c/o MAG Aerospace Industries LLC 1500 Glenn Curtiss Street Carson, CA 90746 / US | 04 /
Tram, Nguyen c/o MAG Aerospace Industries LLC 1500 Glenn Curtiss Street Carson, CA 90746 / US | 05 /
Huang, Kevin c/o MAG Aerospace Industries LLC 1500 Glenn Curtiss Street Carson, CA 90746 / US | 06 /
Beach, David c/o MAG Aerospace Industries,LLC 1500 Glenn Curtiss Street Carson, CA California 90746 / US | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Phillips & Leigh LLP 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17197391.0 | 19.10.2017 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | US201615331062 | 21.10.2016 Original published format: US201615331062 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312353 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E03F1/00, F16K3/34 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
E03F1/006 (EP);
F16K3/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPORT VENTIL | [2018/17] | English: | MULTI-PORT VALVE | [2018/17] | French: | SOUPAPE MULTI-PORT | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6370709 (STRADINGER JAY D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,12,13 * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 14; figures 3-6 * [Y] 5 [I] 3,4,8-11; | [XY]US5664761 (WEYAND MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 13 * column 9, line 6 - column 10, line 6; figures 7, 8 * [Y] 5; | [A]US2015128337 (BEACH DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * pages 1-3; figures 5A-5D *; | [A]GB2203461 (WAERTSILAE OY AB) [A] 1-13 * pages 4-9; figures 1, 2, 4 *; | [A]WO2014151319 (MAG AEROSPACE IND LLC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]DE102012023078 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036]; figures 1A-2D *; | [A]US2014101837 (BOODAGHIANS RAZMIK B [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035]; figures 4-9 * |