EP3301272 - UREA TANK AND BASE PLATE WITH AN INTEGRATED HEATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de la Fusée, 98-100 1130 Bruxelles / BE | [2019/35] |
Former [2018/14] | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTIER, Vincent Rue de Boetendael 108 1180 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
LEONARD, Stéphane avenue de l'Arbre Ballon, 110 1090 Bruxelles / BE | 03 /
OP DE BEECK, Joel Liersesteenweg, 336 2547 Lint / BE | 04 /
DOUGNIER, François Bieststraat, 15 3191 Hever / BE | 05 /
WALLING, Nadja 50 rue Saint-Martin 60280 Margny-lès-Compiègne / FR | 06 /
TIPTON, Larry 727 Hunter's Run Avenue Bowling Green, KY 42104 / US | 07 /
NAYDENOV, Volodia rue Emile Goes 7/202 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Vallée-Thiollier, Clémence-Olivia Laure Marie LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 17197580.8 | 15.05.2008 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | FR20070055118 | 16.05.2007 Original published format: FR 0755118 | FR20070056635 | 20.07.2007 Original published format: FR 0756635 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301272 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3301272 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
F24H1/202 (EP,US);
F01N3/2896 (KR,US);
B60K13/04 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,KR,US);
F24H1/185 (EP,US);
H05B3/0014 (US);
H05B3/78 (EP,KR,US);
B60K2015/03427 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2610/10 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2610/1406 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2610/1426 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2018/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HARNSTOFFTANK UND GRUNDPLATTE MIT INTEGRIERTEM ERWÄRMUNGSELEMENT | [2018/14] | English: | UREA TANK AND BASE PLATE WITH AN INTEGRATED HEATING ELEMENT | [2018/14] | French: | RÉSERVOIR D'URÉE ET PLAQUE DE BASE COMPORTANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE CHAUFFAGE INTÉGRÉ | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 20.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08759611.0 / EP2156025 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2008 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | IE | 15.05.2019 | LU | 15.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | GB | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 15.05.2008 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GB | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GB | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GB | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 01.05.2019 | |
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0138704 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]); | [Y]DE10256727 (ERHARD & SOEHNE GMBH [DE]); | [XY]EP1582732 (DBK DAVID & BAADER GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO2006064001 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al); | [X]WO2006131201 (EICHENAUER HEIZELEMENTE GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2007017080 (EICHENAUER HEIZELEMENTE GMBH [DE], et al); | [XP]WO2008023021 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) | by applicant | WO2006064001 | US7268325 | FR20060007531 |