EP3291629 - ARRANGEMENTS FOR FRAME TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/10] | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR FRAME TRANSMISSIONS | ||
[2022/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QI, Emily 8407 104th Street NW Gig Harbor, Washington 98332 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Po-Kai 1281 Marcello Dr San Jose, California 95131 / US | 03 /
STEPHENS, Adrian 64 Lamb's Lane Cottenham Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB24 8TA / GB | 04 /
PARK, Minyoung 12694 NW Milazzo Ln. San Ramon, California 94582 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2018/10] | 01 /
QI, Emily 8407 104th Street NW Gig Harbor, Washington 98332 / US | ||
02 /
HUANG, Po-Kai 1281 Marcello Dr San Jose, California 95131 / US | |||
03 /
STEPHENS, Adrian 64 Lamb's Lane Cottenham Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB24 8TA / GB | |||
04 /
PARK, Minyoung 12694 NW Milazzo Ln. Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [2023/28] |
Former [2018/10] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17197682.2 | 16.01.2014 | [2018/10] | Priority number, date | US201361753108P | 16.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361753108 P | US201313931921 | 29.06.2013 Original published format: US201313931921 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291629 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3291629 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W56/00, // H04W8/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,US);
H04L7/04 (US);
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04W74/08 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | H04W74/08, H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNGEN FÜR RAHMENÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2022/36] | English: | ARRANGEMENTS FOR FRAME TRANSMISSIONS | [2022/36] | French: | AGENCEMENTS DE TRANSMISSIONS DE TRAMES | [2022/36] |
Former [2018/10] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN FÜR RAHMENÜBERTRAGUNGEN | ||
Former [2018/10] | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR FRAME TRANSMISSIONS | ||
Former [2018/10] | PROCÉDÉS ET AGENCEMENTS DE TRANSMISSIONS DE TRAMES | Examination procedure | 23.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 23.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14741161.5 / EP2946504 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | LU | 16.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009287827 (HORN GAVIN BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0043] - [0051] *; | [XI]US2012182890 (LI JUNYI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10-13,15 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0032] * [I] 6,8,9,14 |