EP3474220 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A CHARGED TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR A PASSENGER IN A MEANS OF TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLÄNZER, Martin Brunhildenstrasse 23 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 02 /
WALSER, Christoph Frohburgstr. 94 8006 Zürich / CH | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17197746.5 | 23.10.2017 | [2019/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474220 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/30, G07B15/02, // G06Q20/14 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G07B15/02 (EP);
G06Q20/327 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG EINER GEBÜHRENPFLICHTIGEN TRANSPORTLEISTUNG FÜR EINEN PASSAGIER IN EINEM VERKEHRSMITTEL | [2019/17] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING A CHARGED TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR A PASSENGER IN A MEANS OF TRANSPORT | [2019/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN SERVICE DE TRANSPORT DEVANT ÊTRE DÉBITÉ POUR UN PASSAGER DANS UN MOYEN DE TRANSPORT | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1210693 (HAENI PROLECTRON AG [CH]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP1334471 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0009] *; | [Y]US2005215265 (SHARMA SANJEEV K [US]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0021] *; | [I]EP1638052 (ATRON ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [A]EP2991024 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]WO2017027369 (CUBIC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0145] * * figure 9B *; | [A]DE102016213395 (INIT INNOVATIVE INFORMATIKANWENDUNGEN IN TRANSPORT- VERKEHRS- UND LEITSYSTEMEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A] - Vlugt, Eric; VP Product Marketing Verifone, "BLUETOOTH LOW ENERGY, BEACONS AND RETAIL TABLE OF CONTENTS", (20131023), Verifone.com, URL: http://global-old.verifone.com/media/3603729/bluetooth-low-energy-beacons-retail-wp.pdf, (20150902), XP055210716 [A] 3-5,7 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 37 * |