Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
21.02.2020 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.02.2020 | First examination report | |
22.10.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.04.2019 | Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.03.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.03.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
08.03.2019 | Change - designated states | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
05.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.01.2019 | Change - applicant | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
10.08.2018 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
25.10.2017 | Change - representative |