blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3373617

EP3373617 - OUT-OF-BAND RADIO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2020Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.08.2020  [2020/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2019/08]
Former [2018/37]For all designated states
Aruba Networks, Inc.
3333 Scott Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOUNDINYA, Shruthi
3333 Scott Boulevard, Building D
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
02 / KAMTHE, Ankur
3333 Scott Boulevard, Building D
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
 [2018/37]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
One Portwall Square
Portwall Lane
Bristol BS1 6BH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/37]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date17197998.224.10.2017
[2018/37]
Priority number, dateUS20171545511209.03.2017         Original published format: US201715455112
[2018/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3373617
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2018
ClassificationIPC:H04W8/00, H04W4/80
[2018/37]
CPC:
H04W8/005 (EP,US); H04B5/72 (CN); H04W48/10 (CN,US);
H04B5/79 (CN); H04W4/80 (EP,US); H04W48/16 (CN,US);
H04W48/20 (CN); H04W84/12 (US); H04W88/08 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Former [2018/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BANDEXTERNER FUNK[2018/37]
English:OUT-OF-BAND RADIO[2018/37]
French:RADIO HORS BANDE[2018/37]
Examination procedure28.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2020Application withdrawn by applicant  [2020/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009221283  (SOLIMAN SAMIR S [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0054] * * figures 4,5 *;
 [Y]US2014038651  (PONNUSWAMY SUBBURAJAN [US]) [Y] 4* paragraph [0028] *;
 [XI]US2015222527  (SHAH VARUN [US], et al) [X] 7,12-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0037] * * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 9,11;
 [XI]US9282582  (DUNSBERGEN BEN [US], et al) [X] 7,8,10,13 * column 22, line 33 - line 50 * * column 15, line 57 - column 16, line 5 * * column 23, line 48 - column 24, line 35 * * figures 8, 16 * [I] 9,11;
 [X]US2016095061  (VAINAPEL KOBY [IL], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0 31] , [0034] *;
 [X]US2016150357  (JUNG BU-SEOP [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0097] , [ 195] , [0242] * * figures 5, 9 *;
 [XYI]US9538356  (HUGHES ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 8 - line 37 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4 [I] 5,6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.