EP3312731 - METHOD FOR DETECTING CABLE INSERTION AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baek, Su-Ho 105-409, 36, Handeul-ro, Dalseo-gu Daegu / KR | 02 /
Jun, Intae 111-1006, 33, Jangsannam-ro, Dalseo-gu Daegu / KR | 03 /
Kwak, Jae-Jin 105-1101, 69, Okgyebuk-ro Gyeongsangbuk-do Gumi-si / KR | 04 /
Heo, Cheoleun 15-201, 265, Seombat-ro, Nowon-gu Seoul / KR | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 17198028.7 | 24.10.2017 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | KR20160138327 | 24.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160138327 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312731 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G06F13/4081 (EP,US);
H01R13/6683 (KR);
G06F1/266 (US);
G06F13/4226 (EP,US);
H01R13/6616 (KR);
H04M1/0274 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON KABELEINFÜHRUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2018/17] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING CABLE INSERTION AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREOF | [2018/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'INSERTION DE CÂBLE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ASSOCIÉ | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 24.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 18.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005114580 (EDE CLIFFORD [GB]) [X] 1,5,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6-9,12,13; | [I]WO2008068311 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 30, paragraph 5 - page 34, paragraph 4 ** figures 6a, 6b *; | [XI] - ANONYMOUS, "UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS SPECIFICATION, 7.2 POWER DISTRIBUTION", UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS SPECIFICATION, XX, XX, (20000427), no. REV. 2.0, pages 171 - 174, XP001152265 [X] 1,5,10,11,14,15 * page 174 - page 174 * [I] 2-4,6-9,12,13 |