EP3296317 - TOPK PEPTIDES AND VACCINES INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OncoTherapy Science, Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3-Chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yusuke The Institute of Medical Science The University of Tokyo 6-1 Shirokanedai 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8639 / JP | 02 /
OSAWA, Ryuji Oncotherapy Science Inc. 2-1 Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Tomohisa OncoTherapy Science Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 04 /
NAKAYAMA, Gaku Oncotherapy Science Inc. 2-1 Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 05 /
TSUNODA, Takuya OncoTherapy Science Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 06 /
YOSHIMURA, Sachiko OncoTherapy Science Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2018/12] | Application number, filing date | 17198358.8 | 25.10.2012 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | US201161552817P | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161552817 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3296317 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3296317 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K38/00, A61K48/00, A61P35/00, C07K16/18, C12N5/10, C12N15/09, G01N33/574, A61K39/00, C07K14/47, // C07K16/40, C12N9/12, G01N33/50 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/001162 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C07K7/06 (CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/0005 (CN,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K39/464462 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/4748 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/18 (CN,KR,US);
C07K16/40 (CN,KR,US);
C12N9/12 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Y207/12002 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/505 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/5154 (KR);
A61K2039/572 (CN,KR,US);
A61K39/005 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TOPK-PEPTIDE UND IMPFSTOFFE DAMIT | [2018/12] | English: | TOPK PEPTIDES AND VACCINES INCLUDING THE SAME | [2018/12] | French: | PEPTIDES TOPK ET VACCINS LES COMPORTANT | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12844519.4 / EP2771350 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2012 | AL | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | WO2008018642 [ ] (ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE INC [JP], et al); | [A]EP1972639 (CELL SIGNALING TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [XI]US2011229504 (FRITSCHE JENS [DE], et al); | by applicant | JPS6317688 | US4722848 | US5108921 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5580859 | US5589466 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | US5679647 | WO9804720 | US5736524 | US5739118 | US5804566 | WO9903499 | US5922687 | JPH11510507 | WO9967288 | JP2000509281 | US6150584 | WO02072631 | WO03027322 | US2004209295 | WO2006031221 | WO2007032255 |