EP3450250 - DEVICE FOR INCREASING THE FRONT VISIBILITY OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gitto, Antonino Via Salvatore Petronio Russo, 25 95031 Adrano (CT) / IT | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Romano, Giuseppe, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17198643.3 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | IT202017098709U | 04.09.2017 Original published format: IT 202017098709 U | [2019/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450250 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/12, B62D25/10 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
B60Q1/18 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2607 (EP);
B60Q1/2615 (EP);
B60Q1/28 (EP);
B60Q1/32 (EP);
B60Q1/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER FRONTSICHT EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2019/10] | English: | DEVICE FOR INCREASING THE FRONT VISIBILITY OF A VEHICLE | [2019/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR AUGMENTER LA VISIBILITÉ AVANT D'UN VÉHICULE | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB873639 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10,11,13 * page 1, lines 16-36 * * page 2, lines 37-41,62-65,84-109; figures 1-4,5a,8 * [Y] 3,9,12; | [X]JPH03197248 (SAKAE SHOJI KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5779345 (ADAMS ELROY [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, lines 44-66 * * column 5, lines 55-57 * * column 6, lines 44-48; figures 1,2,5 *; | [XA]DE202006008430U (CHIEN CHIU WEN [TW]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0007] , [0015]; figures 2,5 * [A] 3; | [Y]US2008036582 (FARLEY WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 3,9,12* paragraphs [0039] , [0040]; figure 2 * |