EP3315000 - UTILITY ROBOTIC VEHICLE WITH SUSPENDED COVER FOR CONTACT DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Takuya c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 17198801.7 | 27.10.2017 | [2018/18] | Priority number, date | JP20160213434 | 31.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016213434 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3315000 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3315000 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/00, G05D1/02, A01D34/64, A01D34/74, A01D34/78, A01D34/81, A01D34/82, A01D101/00 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
G05D1/0227 (EP,US);
A01D34/81 (US);
A01D34/008 (EP,US);
A01D34/78 (US);
A01D34/828 (US);
A01D2101/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | A01D34/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | ROBOTER MIT AUFGEHÄNGTER HÜLLE ZUR KONTAKTERKENNUNG | [2018/18] | English: | UTILITY ROBOTIC VEHICLE WITH SUSPENDED COVER FOR CONTACT DETECTION | [2018/18] | French: | VÉHICULE ROBOTIQUE COMPRENANT UNE JUPE SUSPENDUE POUR DETECTER LES CONTACTS | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2017 | AL | 24.07.2019 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IE | 27.10.2019 | LU | 27.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.10.2017 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.10.2017 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]CN102523841 (POSITEC POWER TOOLS SUZHOU CO) [I] 1,5 * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] - [0043] , [0046] - [0048]; figures 1-5; claims 1,9 * [A] 2-4,6-8; | [I]WO2014007728 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] , [0025] - [0028] - [0030] - [0031]; figures 2A,2B,3-4; claims 1,3,7,9 *; | [ADP]WO2017109879 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [ADP] 1-8* paragraphs [0058] - [0059]; figures 1-4; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO2017109879 |