EP3318721 - COOLED STRUCTURE FOR A GAS TURBINE AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2023/02] |
Former [2018/19] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNOS, Daniel Robert 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615-4614 / US | 02 /
SEZER, Ibrahim 300 Garlington Road GTTL 1356 Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615-4614 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex/ Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2018/19] | Lee, Brenda GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17199314.0 | 31.10.2017 | [2018/19] | Priority number, date | US201615343369 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US201615343369 | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3318721 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3318721 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D25/12, F01D11/08 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (CN);
F02C7/12 (US);
F01D25/12 (EP,CN,US);
F01D9/02 (CN);
F02C3/04 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2018/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEKÜHLTE STRUKTUR FÜR EINE GASTURBINE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE GASTURBINE | [2018/19] | English: | COOLED STRUCTURE FOR A GAS TURBINE AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE | [2018/19] | French: | STRUCTURE REFROIDIE POUR TURBINE À GAZ ET TURBINE À GAZ ASSOCIÉE | [2018/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 09.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | ES | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | IT | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | NL | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
IT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 11.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005100437 (PHILLIPS JAMES S [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-10 * pages 1-6 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021] *; | [XY]US2012057960 (BERRONG ERIC C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] * [Y] 4; | [X]US8388300 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * figures 2, 5 * * column 2, line 49 - line 61 * * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 15 *; | [X]US2015007581 (SEZER IBRAHIM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * figures 1-5, 7, 10, 11 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]US2015110612 (BRANDL HERBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 1, 2, 6, 7 ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * | Examination | US5993150 |