EP3321549 - BUTTERFLY VALVE, VALVE SEAT AND VALVE SEAT RETAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flowserve Management Company 5215 North O'Connor Boulevard, Suite 2300 Irving, TX 75039 / US | [2021/23] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Flowserve Management Company 5215 North O'Connor Boulevard, Suite 2300 Irving, TX 75039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Michael P. 1036 West 430 North Lehi, UT Utah 84043 / US | 02 /
WINKEL, Laren J. 6921 West 10150 North Highland, UT Utah 84003 / US | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2021/23] |
Former [2018/20] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17199415.5 | 26.06.2008 | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321549 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3321549 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/226 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
F16K1/2266 (EP,US);
F16K1/2263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/52] |
Former [2018/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DROSSELVENTIL, VENTILSITZ UND VENTILSITZTELLER | [2018/20] | English: | BUTTERFLY VALVE, VALVE SEAT AND VALVE SEAT RETAINER | [2018/20] | French: | VANNE PAPILLON, SIÈGE DE SOUPAPE ET RETENUE DE SIÈGE DE SOUPAPE | [2018/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 15.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08781047.9 / EP2304284 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | ES | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | NL | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | LU | 26.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | [2023/24] |
Former [2022/34] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4120482 (COX DEREK MICHAEL) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 54; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPS5510104 (NBS CO LTD) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [X]GB2061462 (LITTON INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0123380 (JAMESBURY CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE8411124U (BRÜCKEN FERDI W.) [X] 1-3 * page 2, paragraph l - page 3, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | by applicant | US3940108 | US4331319 |