EP3480426 - ADAPTIVELY MACHINING OF A WORKPIECE WITH AN AEROFOIL SHAPED SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szijarto, Janos Berganäsvägen 21 61291 Finspong / SE | 02 /
Wiklund, Mats Stenstorpvägen 33 58935 Linköping / SE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17199735.6 | 02.11.2017 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480426 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
F01D5/147 (EP);
F05D2230/10 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE BEARBEITUNG EINES WERKSTÜCKS MIT EINEM FLÜGELFÖRMIGEN ABSCHNITT | [2019/19] | English: | ADAPTIVELY MACHINING OF A WORKPIECE WITH AN AEROFOIL SHAPED SECTION | [2019/19] | French: | USINAGE ADAPTATIF D'UNE PIÈCE À USINER AYANT UNE SECTION EN FORME DE SURFACE PORTANTE | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2070641 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * [I] 2-12; | [XI]EP2816430 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0023] , [0053] , [0062] - [0066]; figure 3 * [I] 2-12; | [X]US9228437 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 14* figure - * |