EP3333377 - METERED ORIFICE FOR MOTORING OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAALOUF, Fadi S. 45 Chatham Fields Road East Hampton, CT Connecticut 06424 / US | 02 /
BINTZ, Matthew E. 1814 Boulevard West Hartford, CT Connecticut 06107 / US | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/24] | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17200204.0 | 06.11.2017 | [2018/24] | Priority number, date | US201615363434 | 29.11.2016 Original published format: US201615363434 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333377 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333377 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D19/02, F02C7/27, F02C7/277 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
F02C7/27 (EP,US);
B64D27/10 (US);
B64D31/02 (US);
B64D31/12 (US);
F01D19/02 (EP,US);
F02C7/26 (US);
F02C7/277 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2260/85 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] |
Former [2018/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DOSIERÖFFNUNG FÜR DAS ANLASSEN EINES GASTURBINENMOTORS | [2018/24] | English: | METERED ORIFICE FOR MOTORING OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2018/24] | French: | ORIFICE DE DOSAGE POUR L'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 13.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2017 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | IE | 06.11.2020 | LU | 06.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/31] | HU | 06.11.2017 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MK | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 06.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.11.2017 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 06.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.11.2017 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 06.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 06.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2514949 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2014373552 (ZACCARIA PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0054] * | by applicant | US2011077783 |