EP3319320 - ADAPTIVE MEDIA STREAMING METHOD AND APPARATUS ACCORDING TO DECODING PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanwha Vision Co., Ltd. 6, Pangyo-ro 319beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | [2023/35] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Hanwha Techwin Co., Ltd. 6, Pangyo-ro 319beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do, 13488 / KR | ||
Former [2018/19] | For all designated states Hanwha Techwin Co., Ltd. 1204 (Seongju-dong), Changwon-daero Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 51542 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Byung In 1204 (Seongju-dong), Changwon-daero, Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 02 /
Cheung, Sweung Won 1204 (Seongju-dong), Changwon-daero, Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 17200312.1 | 07.11.2017 | [2018/19] | Priority number, date | KR20160147633 | 07.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160147633 | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3319320 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3319320 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3319320 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2343, H04N21/45, H04N21/61, H04N21/81, H04N21/845, H04N21/4782, H04L65/61, H04L65/65, H04L65/75 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/434 (KR);
H04N21/6437 (CN);
H04L65/764 (EP,US);
H04L65/61 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (CN);
H04N21/4347 (KR);
H04N21/4348 (KR);
H04N21/4402 (CN);
H04N21/4516 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (CN);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/8173 (EP,US);
H04N21/8193 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | H04N21/2343, H04N21/45, H04N21/61, H04N21/81, H04N21/845, H04N21/4782 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ADAPTIVEN MEDIEN-STREAMING IN ÜBEREINSTIMMUNG MIT DER DECODIERUNGSLEISTUNG | [2018/19] | English: | ADAPTIVE MEDIA STREAMING METHOD AND APPARATUS ACCORDING TO DECODING PERFORMANCE | [2018/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DIFFUSION EN CONTINU DE MÉDIAS ADAPTATIFS EN FONCTION DE LA PERFORMANCE DE DÉCODAGE | [2018/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 07.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.07.2023 | 20.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009142038 (NISHIKAWA MASARU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0048] , [0054] - [0055] *; | [I]US2013044260 (VESTERGAARD STEVEN ERIK [CA], et al) [I] 1-3 * figures 1,3-7,10 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0013] , [0042] - [0043] - [0045] - [0046] - [0051] - [0056] - [0059] - [0061] - [0078] , [0080] , [0082] , [0087] , [0095] - [0096] * * paragraphs [0104] , [0115] - [0116] - [0140] , [0146] , [0150] , [0155] , [0167] - [0169] - [0179] - [0180] - [0183] *; | [I]EP2819417 (CANON KK [JP]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0046] *; | [I]EP2835982 (VIRTUAL CABLE COMPANY BVBA [BE]) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] , [0015] - [0019] - [0059] * * claim 5 *; | [I]US2016029002 (BALKO SOEREN [AU]) [I] 1-5,8-12 * abstract * * pages 1-2 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] - [0012] - [0017] , [0021] - [0028] - [0032] - [0034] - [0042] , [0044] , [0050] - [0053] - [0056] *; | [I]US2016173959 (SEEMA ADOLPH [US], et al) [I] 1,4 * figures 2-3 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] - [0033] - [0034] - [0037] , [0053] - [0056] *; | [I]JP2016136676
(NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI | [A] - Dominic Szablewski, "HTML5 Live Video Streaming via WebSockets - PhobosLab", (20130911), URL: http://phoboslab.org/log/2013/09/html5-live-video-streaming-via-websockets, (20170724), XP055393290 [A] 1-15 * pages 1-2, 13 * | [XY] - GUOLEI ZHU ET AL, "HTML5 based media player for real-time video surveillance", IMAGE AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CISP), 2012 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON, IEEE, (20121016), doi:10.1109/CISP.2012.6469806, ISBN 978-1-4673-0965-3, pages 245 - 248, XP032336407 [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [000I] , [0 II] , [0III] , [0 IV] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CISP.2012.6469806 | [I] - Anonymous, "HTML5 RTSP Player ? Streamedian/html5_rtsp_player Wiki ? GitHub", (20160523), URL: https://github.com/Streamedian/html5_rtsp_player/wiki/HTML5-RTSP-Player/c09222ab2c6d20da7fca626225d8d7f5095528b1, (20170725), XP055393639 [I] 1 * page 1 * | [Y] - Ashish Thapa, "HTML5 AS A CROSS-PLATFORM FOR MOBILE APPLICATIONS DEVELOPMENT", Bachelor's thesis of Oulu University of Applied Sciences, (20120601), pages 1 - 73, URL: http://publications.theseus.fi/bitstream/handle/10024/51443/Thapa_Ashish.pdf?sequence=1, (20130131), XP055051965 [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [05.1] , [05.2] * | [X] - Marcus Lindfeldt ET AL, "Real-time video streaming with HTML5", (20140820), URL: http://sam.cs.lth.se/ExjobGetFile?id=687, (20180206), XP055448045 [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [02.3] , [2.3.1] , [2.3.2] , [2.4.2] * * paragraphs [03.3] , [3.3.2] * * paragraphs [4.2.1] , [4.2.2] , [04.3] * * paragraph [05.2] * |