EP3482817 - MEMBRANE BUNDLE PRESENTATION WITH SPACERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wiese, Frank Starenstr. 100 42389 Wuppertal / DE | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17200834.4 | 09.11.2017 | [2019/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3482817 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/02 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D63/0231 (EP);
B01D63/024 (EP,US);
B01D63/033 (EP);
B01D2313/10 (EP);
B01D2313/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEMBRANBÜNDELAUFMACHUNG MIT ABSTANDSHALTERN | [2019/20] | English: | MEMBRANE BUNDLE PRESENTATION WITH SPACERS | [2019/20] | French: | HABILLAGE DE FAISCEAUX DE MEMBRANES POURVU D'ÉLÉMENTS D'ÉCARTEMENT | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2825065 (FRESENIUS CHEM PHARM IND); | [I]JPH0260658 (TERUMO CORP); | [IA]JP2003290340 (NIKKISO CO LTD); | [A]EP1634639 (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [X]DE102013017375 (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2017167443 (ENMODES GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US4066553 | US4293418 | EP0329980 | US4940617 | EP0442147 | EP0464737 | DE4308850 | WO9534373 | EP0732141 | EP0841086 | EP0848987 | US2010035374 |