EP3483153 - COMPOUNDS COMPRISING TRIAZINE GROUP, FLUORENE-GROUP AND ARYL GROUP AND THEIR USE IN ORGANIC ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novaled GmbH Elisabeth-Boer-Str. 9 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states Novaled GmbH Tatzberg 49 01307 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze, Benjamin Tatzberg 49 01307 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Luschtinetz, Regina Tatzberg 49 01307 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Pavicic, Domagoj Tatzberg 49 01307 Dresden / DE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17200890.6 | 09.11.2017 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483153 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/08, C07D407/04, C07D407/14, C07D251/24, H01L27/32 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
C07D251/24 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/654 (US);
C07D401/08 (EP,US);
C07D401/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (KR);
C07D405/04 (KR);
C07D407/04 (EP,US);
C07D407/14 (EP,US);
H01B1/12 (US);
H10K50/00 (KR);
H10K85/657 (KR);
H10K85/6572 (KR);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTEND TRIAZIN, FLUOREN UND ARYL GRUPPEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN ORGANISCHEN ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/20] | English: | COMPOUNDS COMPRISING TRIAZINE GROUP, FLUORENE-GROUP AND ARYL GROUP AND THEIR USE IN ORGANIC ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2019/20] | French: | COMPOSÉS COMPRENANT DU GROUPS TRIAZINE, FLUORENE ET ARYLE ET LEUR APPLICATION EN DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES ORGANIQUES | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 06.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2017065419 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MATERIALS KOREA LTD [KR]); | [XI]WO2017171376 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US6140763 | JP2001291593 | US6614176 | US2003165711 | WO2005086251 | WO2007107306 | WO2007107356 | EP1837926 | JP2008195623 | WO2013079217 | WO2013079676 | WO2013079678 | US2016248022 |