EP3483431 - WIND TURBINE WORKING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parkwind NV Sint-Maartenstraat 5 3000 Leuven / BE | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanden Haute, Cedric Hortensialaan 9 8400 Oostende / BE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 17201571.1 | 14.11.2017 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483431 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3483431 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3483431 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/25, E02B17/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
F03D13/25 (EP,KR,US);
E02B2017/0091 (EP,KR);
F05B2230/232 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2230/61 (EP,KR);
F05B2240/95 (KR,US);
F05B2280/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENARBEITSBÜHNE | [2019/20] | English: | WIND TURBINE WORKING PLATFORM | [2019/20] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE TRAVAIL DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 15.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2021
07.05.2021
ADMISSIBLE Vattenfall AB Evenemangsgatan 13 169 56 Solna / SE Opponent's representative Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2023/04] |
Former [2021/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2021
Vattenfall AB Evenemangsgatan 13 169 56 Solna / SE Opponent's representative Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 21.05.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.12.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.03.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.06.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 02.03.2023 | Appeal received No. T0458/23 | 02.03.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 31.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2017 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | LU | 14.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 14.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012001345 (WIGGS PHILIP WILLIAM GEORGE [GB]); | [A]EP2418383 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [AD]EP2586933 (AREVA WIND GMBH [DE]); | [A]KR20140085695 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]); | [A]US2015316024 (LARSEN GERNER [DK], et al); | [A]WO2016175339 (KLES INC [KR]) | by applicant | US2015292175 | Opposition | US4007598 | US7163355 | WO2008006377 | WO2010059209 | WO2012001345 | EP2520533 | WO2013137744 | US2013266453 | US2014196654 | US9120542 | US2015292175 | US2015316024 | ES2608504 | EP3002456 | EP3104003 |