EP3309845 - SHIELDED ELECTRICAL CONTACT AND DOPING THROUGH A PASSIVATING DIELECTRIC LAYER IN A HIGH-EFFICIENCY CRYSTALLINE SOLAR CELL, INCLUDING STRUCTURE AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetrasun, Inc. 20640 Third Street Suite 250A Saratoga, California 95070 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAFTS, Douglas E. 18760 Blythswood Drive Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 02 /
SCHULTZ-WITTMAN, Oliver Bartelssaal 27 22359 Hamburg / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2018/16] | 01 /
CRAFTS, Douglas E. 18760 Blythswood Drive Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | ||
02 /
SCHULTZ-WITTMAN, Oliver 970 Corte Madera Avenue Apt. 401 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Representative(s) | Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB Widenmayerstraße 49 80538 München / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 17201715.4 | 25.03.2011 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | US20100318099P | 26.03.2010 Original published format: US 318099 P | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3309845 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3309845 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042, H01L31/0236, H01L31/06, H01L31/18, H01L31/0216, H01L31/0224, H01L31/0352 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/02167 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/02363 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/02366 (US);
H01L31/03529 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/1804 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/186 (US);
H01L31/1868 (US);
Y02E10/52 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | ABGESCHIRMTER ELEKTRISCHER KONTAKT UND DOTIERUNG DURCH EINE PASSIVIERENDE DIELEKTRISCHE SCHICHT IN EINER HOCHEFFIZIENTEN KRISTALLINEN SOLARZELLE, ZUGEHÖRIGE STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2018/16] | English: | SHIELDED ELECTRICAL CONTACT AND DOPING THROUGH A PASSIVATING DIELECTRIC LAYER IN A HIGH-EFFICIENCY CRYSTALLINE SOLAR CELL, INCLUDING STRUCTURE AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2018/16] | French: | CONTACT ÉLECTRIQUE BLINDÉ ET DOPAGE À TRAVERS UNE COUCHE DIÉLECTRIQUE PASSIVANTE DANS UNE CELLULE SOLAIRE CRISTALLINE À HAUT RENDEMENT, Y COMPRIS STRUCTURE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11760277.1 / EP2553735 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5449626 (HEZEL RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1-12 * columns 7,11,12; figures 1,2,9 *; | [A]WO9848462 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 9; figures 5-7 *; | [A]JP3872428B (SHINETSU CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-12* abstract * |