EP3321334 - INK-SET FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-COLOURED SURFACE ON GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Durst Phototechnik Digital Technology GmbH Julius-Durst-Strasse 11 9900 Lienz / AT | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINGARTNER, Peter Dölsach 119 9991 Dölsach / AT | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 17202384.8 | 07.04.2011 | [2018/20] | Priority number, date | AT20100000573 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: AT 5732010 | [2018/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321334 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/101, C09D11/36, C09D11/40, B41M5/00, // C03C17/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
B41M5/0047 (EP,US);
B28B11/001 (EP);
B28B11/044 (EP);
B28B11/048 (EP);
B41J11/00216 (EP,US);
B41J11/0022 (EP,US);
B41J11/0024 (EP,US);
C03C17/04 (EP,US);
C03C8/16 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/36 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
C09D5/29 (EP,US);
B41J11/002 (EP,US);
B41J3/407 (EP,US);
B41M3/008 (EP,US);
B41M5/0011 (EP,US);
B41M5/007 (EP,US);
B41M7/0072 (EP,US);
B41M7/009 (EP,US);
C03C2218/119 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | DRUCKTINTENSYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRFÄRBIGEN OBERFLÄCHE AUF GLAS | [2018/20] | English: | INK-SET FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-COLOURED SURFACE ON GLASS | [2018/20] | French: | JEU D'ENCRES POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE SURFACE À PLUSIEURS COULEURS SUR DU VERRE | [2018/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 03.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11161510.0 / EP2412534 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005019360 (IND TECHNO LOGIC SOLUTIONS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * * insbesondere die Ansprüche 1-22, 32 und 33, Seite 15 Zeilen 1 und 2 sowie den die Seiten 20 und 21 überbrückenden Absatz * [I] 2-7; | [A]WO2008101539 (XENNIA TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document ** insbesondere Seite 9 Zeile 5 bis Seite 12 Zeile 17, Seite 13 Zeilen 5-19, Seite 26 Zeile 16 bis Seite 28 Zeile 16 sowie die Ansprüche 20-24, 39-47 und 49 * | by applicant | US6336723 | US2003043246 | EP1350629 | WO2005018941 | WO2005019360 | US2006093797 | WO2006084614 | WO2008101539 | WO2009157262 |