EP3324190 - SLIDE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakura Finetek U.S.A., Inc. 1750 West 214th Street Torrance, CA 90501 / US | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON BUEREN, Erico c/o Sakura Finetek U.S.A., Inc. - 1750 West 214th Street TORRANCE, CALIFORNIA 90501 / US | 02 /
VAN DEN BERG, Ralf c/o Sakura Finetek Europe B.V. - Flemingweg 10A 2408 AV ALPHEN AAN DEN RIJN / NL | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2018/21] | Application number, filing date | 17202516.5 | 20.11.2017 | [2018/21] | Priority number, date | US201615359484 | 22.11.2016 Original published format: US201615359484 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324190 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
G01N35/00029 (EP,BR,CN,US);
G01N35/00603 (EP,BR,US);
G01N35/021 (CN);
G02B21/002 (BR,US);
G02B21/34 (BR,US);
G02B21/365 (BR,US);
G02B21/368 (BR,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
H04N23/90 (US);
G01N2035/00039 (US);
G01N2035/00138 (CN);
G06T2207/10056 (US);
G06T2207/30024 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/21] | English: | SLIDE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2018/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DIAPOSITIVES | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 30.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2023 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 03.05.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 30.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014273086 (LEFEBVRE GILLES [US]); | [XAI]US2015177504 (BICKERT STEFAN [DE], et al) |