EP3352010 - RUN-OFF PATH TO COLLECT LIQUID FOR AN IMMERSION LITHOGRAPHY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Novak, Thomas W. 1205 Lakeview Drive Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 17202526.4 | 01.04.2004 | [2018/30] | Priority number, date | US20030462114P | 10.04.2003 Original published format: US 462114 P | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352010 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/42, G03F7/20 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
G03F7/70341 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (KR);
G03F7/70716 (EP,US);
G03F7/7095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/10] |
Former [2018/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABLAUFWEG ZUM SAMMELN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN FÜR EINE IMMERSIONSLITHOGRAPHIEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/30] | English: | RUN-OFF PATH TO COLLECT LIQUID FOR AN IMMERSION LITHOGRAPHY APPARATUS | [2018/30] | French: | TRAJET D'ÉCOULEMENT PERMETTANT DE RECUEILLIR UN LIQUIDE POUR UN APPAREIL DE LITHOGRAPHIE PAR IMMERSION | [2018/30] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 21.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 23.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04759084.9 / EP1611482 | EP15163158.7 / EP2921905 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0605103 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 41 - column 12, line 7; figures 1-3,6-8 *; | [A]JPH10340846 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]WO9949504 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [E]EP1628329 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0040]; figures 1-4 *; | [E]EP1641028 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0048]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0061]; figure 4 *; | [E]EP1699073 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0035]; figures 1,2 ** paragraph [0044]; figure 4 *; | [E]EP1703548 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5 * paragraph [0053]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0092]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | JPH08136475 | US5528118 | US5528100 | JPH08330224 | US5623853 | US5874820 |