Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3335709

Designated contracting statesALLapse: 12.08.2020
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 ISLapse: 12.12.2020
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LULapse: 13.12.2020
 LV 
 MCLapse: 12.08.2020
 MKLapse: 12.08.2020
 MTLapse: 12.08.2020
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 ROLapse: 12.08.2020
 RSLapse: 12.08.2020
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SMLapse: 12.08.2020
 TR 
Examination procedure01.07.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted12.08.2020
Opposition procedure14.05.2021No opposition filed within time limit published on 14.07.2021 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2931268
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:11.07.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:ALLPHIN, CLARK P.
 
Event date:11.07.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:DESJARDIN, MICHAEL
 
Event date:30.01.2019 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:30.01.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20181219
 
Event date:09.10.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20190903BHEP
 
Event date:09.10.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/19 20060101AFI20190903BHEP
 
Event date:09.10.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 25/20 20060101ALI20190903BHEP
 
Event date:16.10.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190920
 
Event date:11.10.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1257033 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:11.03.2020 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED)
 
Event date:18.03.2020 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20200220
 
Event date:12.08.2020 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2931268
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:12.08.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:14.08.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:03.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602013071672 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:15.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1300834 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20200915
 
Event date:02.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:15.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:E. BLUM AND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE , CH
 
Event date:19.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20201013
 
Event date:21.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 3335709 PT 20201021 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20201014
 
Event date:11.11.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:24.11.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:30.11.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION]
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:02.12.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 35544 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:15.12.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E019874 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20201026
 
Event date:25.12.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20201685 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20201210
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:25.12.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20201685 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:19.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20201685 HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:12.01.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20200403026 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20201215
 
Event date:19.02.2020 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:19.09.2019 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:01.02.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1
 
Event date:10.07.2020 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:03.07.2020 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:01.03.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E051060 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201212
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:18.05.2018 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:10.07.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:19.02.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:01.02.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:19.09.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:30.12.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:18.05.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED
 
Event date:20.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI FGE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN FINLAND
 
Event date:19.05.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2827005 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20210519
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:15.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT UEP 1300834 AT T
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:18.06.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:14.05.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602013071672 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:21.07.2021 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20210514
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201213
 
Event date:07.01.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20201685 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20211210
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:18.06.2021 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:30.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:06.01.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20201685 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20221212
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:05.07.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230526
 
Event date:22.12.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20201685 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20231030
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:16.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20231113
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:18.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20231113
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20231127
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20231016
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20231107
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20231116
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20231214
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20231107
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20231219
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20231030
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20231106
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20231110
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20231127
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20231019
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20231212
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20231206
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20231010
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20231025
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20231213
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:16.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20240112
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20240101
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:15.11.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20241004
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:10.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20241007
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20241025
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:17.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:23.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:24.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:12