EP3336097 - PREPARATION OF THE NON-CRYSTALLINE FORM OF OBETICHOLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 10 Hudson Yards, 37th Floor New York, NY 10001 / US | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINER, André PharmaZell GmbH Rosenheimer Str. 43 83064 Raubling / DE | 02 /
WAENERLUND POULSEN, Heidi FeF Chemicals A/S Kobenhavnsvej 216 4600 Køge / DK | 03 /
JOLIBOIS, Emilie Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | 04 /
REWOLINSKI, Melissa 4760 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
GROSS, Ralf PharmaZell GmbH Rosenheimer Str. 43 83064 Raubling / DE | 06 /
SHARP, Emma Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | 07 /
DUBAS-FISHER, Fiona Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | 08 /
EBERLIN, Alex Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/25] | 01 /
STEINER, André PharmaZell GmbH Rosenheimer Str. 43 83064 Raubling / DE | ||
02 /
WAENERLUND POULSEN, Heidi FeF Chemicals A/S Kobenhavnsvej 216 DK-4600 Køge / DK | |||
03 /
JOLIBOIS, Emilie Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | |||
04 /
REWOLINSKI, Melissa 4760 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA California 92121 / US | |||
05 /
GROSS, Ralf PharmaZell GmbH Rosenheimer Str. 43 83064 Raubling / DE | |||
06 /
SHARP, Emma Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | |||
07 /
DUBAS-FISHER, Fiona Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | |||
08 /
EBERLIN, Alex Pharmorphix Ltd. 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0WE / GB | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17202916.7 | 17.06.2013 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | US201261661531P | 19.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261661531 P | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3336097 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3336097 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, C07J51/00, A61K9/20, // A61K31/575 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
C07J9/005 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (KR);
A61K31/575 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,EA);
A61P13/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07J51/00 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/25] | C07J9/00, C07J51/00, // A61K31/575 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] |
Former [2018/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG DER NICHT-KRISTALLINEN FORM VON OBETICHOLSÄURE | [2018/25] | English: | PREPARATION OF THE NON-CRYSTALLINE FORM OF OBETICHOLIC ACID | [2018/25] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE LA FORME NON-CRYSTALLINE D'ACIDE OBETICHOLIQUE | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13733181.5 / EP2861613 | Divisional application(s) | EP20190630.2 / EP3789394 | EP21195801.2 / EP3992201 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2013 | AL | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 19.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1568706 (INTERCEPT PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * examples 1-3 *; | [A]WO2006122977 (ERREGIERRE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 1 *; | [A] - SEPE V ET AL, "Conicasterol E, a small heterodimer partner sparing farnesoid X receptor modulator endowed with a pregnane X receptor agonistic activity, from the marine sponge Theonella swinhoei", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 55, no. 1, doi:10.1021/JM201004P, ISSN 0022-2623, (20120112), pages 84 - 93, (20111129), XP002711362 [A] 1-14 * page 87, scheme 1 * * page 91, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm201004p | [A] - GIOIELLO ANTIMO ET AL, "Extending SAR of bile acids as FXR ligands: discovery of 23-N-(carbocinnamyloxy)-3[alpha],7[alpha]-dihydroxy-6[alpha]-ethyl-24-nor-5[beta]-cholan-23-amine", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 19, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2011.03.004, ISSN 0968-0896, (20110415), pages 2650 - 2658, (20110310), XP002711363 [A] 1-14 * page 2652, scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BMC.2011.03.004 | by applicant | US5023252 | US7138390 | WO2006122977 | US2009062526 | - L. BETTARELLO et al., II Farmaco, (20000000), vol. 55, pages 51 - 55 | - HOOFT et al., J. Appl. Cryst., (20080000), vol. 41, pages 96 - 103 | - J. KERC et al., Thermochim. Acta, (19950000), no. 248, pages 81 - 95 |